FL S7030 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter No. 2023-265, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - Chapter No. 2023-265, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the State Opioid Settlement Trust Fund within the Department of Children and Families; providing the purpose of the trust fund; specifying the funding source for the trust fund; providing for the reversion of certain funds to the Department of Financial Services Opioid Settlement Clearing Trust Fund; providing for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund, etc.
Title
Trust Funds/State Opioid Settlement Trust Fund/Department of Children and Families
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#85 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Chapter No. 2023-265, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239) | |
2023-06-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-06-12 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0 |
2023-04-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-04 | House | Substituted for HB 5301 |
2023-04-03 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2023-04-03 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2023-04-03 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2023-04-03 | House | In Messages |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2023-04-03 | Senate | The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/03/23 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/28/23, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 03/21/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
H5301 (Similar To) 2023-04-04 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239), SB 7030 (Ch. 2023-265)
H5001 (Similar To) 2023-04-04 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239), CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2023-167), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245), HB 5303 (Ch. 2023-246), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240), SB 2504 (Ch. 2023-241), SB 2506 (Ch. 2023-242), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243), SB 7018 (Ch. 2023-244), SB 7024 (Ch. 2023-193), SB 7030 (Ch. 2023-265)
S2500 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-239, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2023-167), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245), HB 5303 (Ch. 2023-246), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240), SB 2504 (Ch. 2023-241), SB 2506 (Ch. 2023-242), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243), SB 7018 (Ch. 2023-244), CS/SB 7024 (Ch. 2023-193), SB 7030 (Ch. 2023-265)
H5001 (Similar To) 2023-04-04 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2023-239), CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2023-167), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245), HB 5303 (Ch. 2023-246), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240), SB 2504 (Ch. 2023-241), SB 2506 (Ch. 2023-242), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243), SB 7018 (Ch. 2023-244), SB 7024 (Ch. 2023-193), SB 7030 (Ch. 2023-265)
S2500 (Similar To) 2023-06-16 - Chapter No. 2023-239, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1285 (Ch. 2023-167), HB 5101 (Ch. 2023-245), HB 5303 (Ch. 2023-246), SB 2502 (Ch. 2023-240), SB 2504 (Ch. 2023-241), SB 2506 (Ch. 2023-242), SB 2510 (Ch. 2023-243), SB 7018 (Ch. 2023-244), CS/SB 7024 (Ch. 2023-193), SB 7030 (Ch. 2023-265)