FL S7028 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising criteria for eligibility for out-of-state fee waivers at state universities, Florida College System institutions, and specified career centers; removing a provision regarding the applicability of waivers to required credit hours for a student's degree or certificate program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educational Opportunities for Veterans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#271 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-76
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-24SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-24HousePassed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2015-04-24HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-23HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-23HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-23HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 35
2015-04-22HouseReceived
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/15
2015-04-22HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-22HouseIn Messages
2015-04-22SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2015-04-22SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-14SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-14SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-10SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/15
2015-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-09SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2015-04-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/09/15, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-05SenateNow in Appropriations
2015-03-04SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 03/04/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-02-20SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2015-02-17SenateFiled
2015-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/17/15, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2015-02-09SenateSubmitted for consideration by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security

Same As/Similar To

H0035 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7028 (Ch. 2015-76)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100926Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback