FL S7014 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2017-62)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2017-62)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending provisions relating to an exemption from public records requirements for nonpublished reports or data related to certain studies or research related to citrus fruit, citrus fruit juices, and the products and byproducts thereof which is conducted, caused to be conducted, or funded by the Department of Citrus; abrogating the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.
Title
OGSR/Nonpublished Reports or Data/Department of Citrus
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2017-62) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Substituted HB 7035 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/17 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/25/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/22/17, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/21/17, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H7035 (Same As) 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-62