FL H7035 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-62
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-02 - Chapter No. 2017-62
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removes scheduled repeal of public records exemption for nonpublished reports & data related to certain studies & research by Department of Citrus.
Title
OGSR/Nonpublished Reports and Data/Dept. of Citrus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#30 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-02 | Chapter No. 2017-62 | |
2017-06-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-02 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Substituted for SB 7014 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from Agriculture; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Received |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-03-29 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/22/17 |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 03/16/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee, 03/07/17, 1:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7014 (Same As) 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2017-62)