FL S2852 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Introduced -SJ 00925; Read 2nd time -SJ 00926; Adopted; companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9107 (Adopted) -SJ 00926
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Introduced -SJ 00925; Read 2nd time -SJ 00926; Adopted; companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9107 (Adopted) -SJ 00926
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Honors Florida's 2008 Summer and 2010 Winter Olympians, 2008 Summer and 2010 Winter Paralympians, and 2007 Summer and 2009 Winter Special Olympians and recognizes their outstanding achievement in their respective sports.
Title
Florida/Olympians/Paralympians/Special Olympians
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-21 | Re-referred To Committee On Appropriations | |
2010-04-16 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H9107 (Similar To) 2010-04-22 - Placed on Ceremonial Resolutions Calendar - Publication only; Read 2nd time -HJ 00924; Adopted; companion bill(s) passed, see SR 2852 (Adopted) -HJ 00925