FL S2774 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1483 (Ch. 2010-264)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1483 (Ch. 2010-264)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends chapter 2009-261, Laws of Florida. Revises district boundaries.
Title
Spring Hill Fire Rescue & EMS Dist./Hernando Co.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1483 (Ch. 2010-264) | |
2010-04-26 | Introduced -SJ 00864; Referred to Rules -SJ 00864 | |
2010-03-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1483 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-264