FL S2584 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Provides additional penalties for the offense of unlawfully distributing handbills in a public lodging establishment. Specifies that certain items used in committing such offense are subject to seizure and forfeiture under the Florida Contraband Forfeiture Act, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Handbill Distribution [SPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-29 - House - House Roll Call No. 1079 - Motion (Y: 72 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0017 - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died on Calendar
2010-04-29 Received -HJ 01261; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01261
2010-04-27 In Messages
2010-04-27 Read 3rd time -SJ 00891; CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 1 -SJ 00892
2010-04-26 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00857
2010-04-20 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00651
2010-04-19 Favorable by- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00651
2010-04-14 On Committee agenda-- Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 37-S
2010-04-13 Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00550; Now in Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00550
2010-04-12 Now in Regulated Industries -SJ 00526; On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/13/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S
2010-04-08 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2010-04-07 CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00546
2010-04-01 On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/07/10, 2:00 pm, 37-S
2010-03-11 Introduced -SJ 00220
2010-03-09 Referred to Criminal Justice; Regulated Industries; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00220
2010-02-26 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H7173 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0509144Amended CodeSee Bill Text
090115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0932701Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback