FL S2518 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposes amendments to the State Constitution to require that 70 percent of school district funding be expended for the purpose of supporting classroom instruction and prohibit any school district from paying its school administrative personnel or noninstructional personnel more than three times the average salary for teachers in the school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education [WPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12
2010-03-11 Introduced -SJ 00215
2010-03-04 Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00215
2010-02-26 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
00908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
00909New CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback