FL S2510 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Florida Business Information Portal within the Department of Business and Professional Regulation; authorizing the Department of Business and Professional Regulation to contract for services to develop the portal; repealing provisions relating to the One-Stop Business Registration Portal Clearing Trust Fund, etc.
Title
Florida Business Information Portal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#54 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in returning Messages |
2015-04-02 | Senate | In returning messages |
2015-04-02 | House | Immediately certified |
2015-04-02 | House | Refused to concur, acceded to request for conference committee |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-02 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (335471) |
2015-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-02 | House | Received |
2015-04-01 | House | In Messages |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The Senate requests that the House pass the bill as passed by the Senate or agree to include the bill in the Budget Conference |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/25/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
H5301 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
H5001 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
S2500 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in returning Messages
H5001 (Similar To) 2015-04-02 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 166 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 1995 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |