FL S2506 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising compensation amounts for representation in a criminal proceeding, etc.
Title
Compensation for Representation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/16 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Filed |
2016-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/03/16, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
S2500 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5005 (Ch. 2016-63), HB 5007 (Ch. 2016-64), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
S2502 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 719 (Ch. 2016-58), CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237), CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239)
H5001 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Chapter No. 2016-66, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5005 (Ch. 2016-63), HB 5007 (Ch. 2016-64), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
H5003 (Similar To) 2016-03-18 - Chapter No. 2016-62, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 499 (Ch. 2016-128), CS/CS/CS/HB 589 (Ch. 2016-130), CS/CS/HB 719 (Ch. 2016-58), CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), CS/CS/HB 1083 (Ch. 2016-140), CS/HB 1335 (Ch. 2016-147), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), CS/HB 7003 (Ch. 2016-3), HB 7027 (Ch. 2016-181), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237), CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239), CS/SB 1322 (Ch. 2016-152)
S2502 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 719 (Ch. 2016-58), CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237), CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239)
H5001 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Chapter No. 2016-66, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), HB 5005 (Ch. 2016-63), HB 5007 (Ch. 2016-64), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), HB 5103 (Ch. 2016-25)
H5003 (Similar To) 2016-03-18 - Chapter No. 2016-62, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 499 (Ch. 2016-128), CS/CS/CS/HB 589 (Ch. 2016-130), CS/CS/HB 719 (Ch. 2016-58), CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), CS/CS/HB 1083 (Ch. 2016-140), CS/HB 1335 (Ch. 2016-147), HB 5001 (Ch. 2016-66), HB 5101 (Ch. 2016-65), CS/HB 7003 (Ch. 2016-3), HB 7027 (Ch. 2016-181), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237), CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239), CS/SB 1322 (Ch. 2016-152)