FL S2378 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on General Government Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on General Government Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Governor to establish the One-Stop Business Workgroup. Authorizes the workgroup to consult with other agencies and use consultants. Provides requirements for the licensing portal plan to implement a technology solution for businesses and individuals to access state business licenses, certifications, and registrations, etc.
Title
Florida's One-Stop Business Connect Act [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on General Government Appropriations | |
2010-04-09 | Now in General Government Appropriations -SJ 00525 | |
2010-04-07 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-06 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00545 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/06/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-03-18 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00269 | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable by Commerce; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 00269 | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce, 03/17/10, 1:00 pm, 401-S | |
2010-03-11 | Introduced -SJ 00204 | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Commerce; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00204 | |
2010-02-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1299 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died pending review of CS