FL S2210 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00883; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 303 -SJ 00883; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 303 (Ch. 2010-84) -SJ 00883
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00883; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 303 -SJ 00883; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 303 (Ch. 2010-84) -SJ 00883
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
(THIS BILL COMBINES S2210 & S1552) Increases the number of members on the Florida Real Estate Appraisal Board. Requires the Florida Real Estate Appraisal Board to adopt certain rules. Requires application, registration, and renewal fees for appraisal management companies. Requires such companies to register with the DBPR. Requires nonresident appraisal management companies to consent to commencement of actions in this state, etc.
Title
Appraisers & Appraisal Management Companies [CPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00883; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 303 -SJ 00883; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 303 (Ch. 2010-84) -SJ 00883 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00785; Amendment(s) adopted (965382) -SJ 00785; Ordered engrossed -SJ 00785 | |
2010-04-21 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute); Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00703 | |
2010-04-19 | CS/CS by- General Government Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 00703; CS read 1st time on 04/21/10 -SJ 00710 | |
2010-04-15 | Now in General Government Appropriations -SJ 00636; On Committee agenda-- General Government Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 401-S | |
2010-04-14 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 00635 | |
2010-04-12 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 00525; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/14/10, 1:00 pm, 110-S | |
2010-04-08 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-08 | -SJ 00545; Remaining combined CS references: Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00525 | |
2010-04-07 | CS combines this bill with SB 1552 -SJ 00525; CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; CS read 1st time on | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 110-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00150 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations | |
2010-02-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1552 (Similar To) 2010-04-07 - CS combines this bill with SB 2210 -SJ 00525; CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/SB 2210 (Laid on Table in Senate) -SJ 00525
H0303 (Similar To) 2010-05-14 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-84
H0303 (Similar To) 2010-05-14 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-84
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0475 | 611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0475 | 613 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0475 | 614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0475 | 6147 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0475 | 6235 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0475 | 624 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0475 | 6245 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
0475 | 626 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0475 | 629 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |