FL H0303 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on May 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-14 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-84
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revises membership of Florida Real Estate Appraisal Board; requires appraisal management companies to register with DBPR; specifies application requirements & procedures; requires application, registration, & renewal fees for appraisal management companies; requires fingerprinting & criminal history records checks of, & provides qualifications for, certain persons who control appraisal management companies, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Estate Appraisers/Appraisal Management Co. [CPSC]

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0003 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-26 - House - House Roll Call No. 0994 - Passage (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-14 Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-84
2010-04-30 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -HJ 01700
2010-04-27 Ordered enrolled -HJ 01177
2010-04-27 Withdrawn from Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00883; Substituted for CS/CS/SB 2210 -SJ 00883; Read 2nd time -SJ 00883; Read 3rd time -SJ 00883; CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 -SJ 00884
2010-04-26 In Messages; Received -SJ 00865; Referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00865
2010-04-26 Read 3rd time -HJ 01086; CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 -HJ 01086
2010-04-23 Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01010
2010-04-15 Placed on Calendar -HJ 00720
2010-04-14 CS read 1st time on 04/14/10 -HJ 00679; Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.20
2010-04-09 CS/CS/CS by- General Government Policy Council; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -HJ 00682
2010-04-07 On Council agenda-- General Government Policy Council, 04/09/10, 11:45 am, Morris Hall
2010-03-31 Now in General Government Policy Council -HJ 00448
2010-03-30 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-31 CS read 1st time on 03/31/10 -HJ 00443
2010-03-26 CS/CS by Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00448
2010-03-24 On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC), 03/26/10, 8:30 am, 116-K
2010-03-08 Now in Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00225
2010-03-05 CS read 1st time on 03/05/10 -HJ 00220; Pending review of CS under Rule 7.20
2010-03-03 CS by Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); YEAS 11 NAYS 1 -HJ 00222
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council -HJ 00032; On Committee agenda-- Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), 03/03/10, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall
2010-03-01 On Committee agenda-- Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC), 03/03/10, 2:00 pm, Webster Hall
2009-11-20 Referred to Insurance, Business, & Financial Affairs Policy (GGPC); Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC); General Government Policy Council
2009-11-03 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S1552 (Similar To) 2010-04-07 - CS combines this bill with SB 2210 -SJ 00525; CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/SB 2210 (Laid on Table in Senate) -SJ 00525
S2210 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00883; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 303 -SJ 00883; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 303 (Ch. 2010-84) -SJ 00883

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0475611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0475613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0475614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04756147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04756235New CodeSee Bill Text
0475624Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04756245New CodeSee Bill Text
0475626Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0475629Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0303&Chamber=House&Year=2010
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb030300.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb030301c1.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb030302c2.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=hb030303c3.html&Directory=session/2010/House/bills/billtext/html/
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/hHB03030426100994.html
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/cgi-bin/view_page.pl?Tab=session&Submenu=1&FT=D&File=session/2010/House/bills/votes/html/SHB03030427100003.html

Bill Comments

feedback