FL S2200 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires net proceeds from a scratch-off lottery game to be allocated to the Division of Vocational Rehabilitation in the DOE to be distributed to programs offering services to individuals with developmental disabilities.
Title
Allocation/Expenditure of State Lottery Revenues [WPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Regulated Industries | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Regulated Industries; Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00149 | |
2010-03-01 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Education Pre-K - 12; Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-02-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0943 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on PreK-12 Appropriations (CEED)