FL S2122 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the Division of Dairy Industry within the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services. Changes the name of the Division of Forestry to the Florida Forest Service. Requires the Department of Legal Affairs, rather than the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, to distribute free of charge a motor vehicle consumer's rights pamphlet. Provides for the state attorneys and the Department of Legal Affairs, rather than the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, to enforce the law prohibiting price gouging, etc.
Title
State Government Operations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#164 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#14 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848 | |
2011-05-07 | Conference Committee Report considered -HJ 1750 | |
2011-05-06 | In returning messages | |
2011-05-06 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1124 | |
2011-04-26 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Williams, T. (Chair), Albritton, Artiles, Bembry, Crisafulli, Goodson, Ingram, Porter, Rooney, Sands -HJ 778 | |
2011-04-26 | ||
2011-04-07 | In returning messages | |
2011-04-07 | In Messages | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time -SJ 426 | |
2011-04-06 | Read 2nd time -SJ 373 | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced -SJ 330 | |
2011-04-04 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 330 | |
2011-04-01 | SPB 7134 submitted as a committee bill (SB 2122) by Budget |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 90 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
501 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 548 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 549 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
601 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
681 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
681 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
681 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
681 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
681 | 1095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
681 | 1096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
681 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
681 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
681 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
681 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
681 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |