FL S2036 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes school districts to deploy school bus traffic infraction detectors under certain circumstances. Provides for use of school bus traffic infraction detectors to enforce specified provisions requiring a person driving a vehicle to stop when approaching a school bus displaying a stop signal. Authorizes the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles, a county, or a municipality to authorize a traffic infraction enforcement officer to issue and enforce a citation for a violation of such provisions, etc.
Title
Uniform Traffic Control
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-26 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12 read 1st time -SJ 498 | |
2011-04-15 | Now in Budget -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-14 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 -SJ 470 | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 04/14/11, 9:15 am, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 1 -SJ 322 | |
2011-03-31 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/05/11, 10:15 am, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-23 | Introduced -SJ 273 | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Transportation; Education Pre-K - 12; Budget -SJ 273 | |
2011-03-15 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 640 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 650 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |