FL S1986 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1679
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1679
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Legislature to set the maximum millage rate for each district; requiring each water management district to submit a preliminary budget for legislative review; requiring the preliminary budget to include certain information; requiring that budget amendments greater than a certain amount be reviewed and approved by the Executive Office of the Governor, which must notify the Legislative Budget Commission of such approval; providing that, upon review and approval by the Executive Office of the Governor and after providing notice of intention to amend to the Legislative Budget Commission, a water management district may amend unanticipated funds into its final budget; requiring that a 5-year water resource development work program describe the district's implementation strategy and funding plan for water resource, water supply, and alternative water supply development components of each approved regional water supply plan, etc.
Title
Water Management Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1215 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#43 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#918 (Y: 96 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#43 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#918 (Y: 96 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1679 | |
2012-03-09 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 -HJ 1623 | |
2012-03-09 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-09 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 34 NAYS 6 -SJ 1206 | |
2012-03-09 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1202 | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Budget Conference Committee on Budget/Appropriations: Alexander (Chair), Negron (Vice Chair), Bennett (At Large), Gaetz (At Large), Gardiner (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Rich (At Large), Thrasher (At Large); Budget Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Bogdanoff (Chair), Evers, Smith, Storms; Budget Conference Committee on Education Pre-K - 12/PreK-12: Simmons (Chair), Detert, Gardiner, Montford, Ring; Budget Conference Committee on Finance and Tax: Norman (Chair), Alexander, Gaetz, Siplin; Budget Conference Committee on General Government/Government Operations: Hays (Chair), Braynon, Bullard, Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Jones, Thrasher; Budget Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Negron (Chair), Fasano, Flores, Garcia, Oelrich, Rich, Richter, Sobel; Budget Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Lynn (Chair), Altman, Sachs, Siplin, Wise; Budget Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Williams, T. (Chair), Artiles, Bembry, Boyd, Crisafulli, Goodson, Porter -HJ 899 | |
2012-02-27 | In returning messages | |
2012-02-27 | Refused to concur, acceded to request for conference committee -HJ 846 | |
2012-02-27 | Received -HJ 845 | |
2012-02-23 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | Immediately certified -SJ 663 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 2nd time -SJ 659 | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced -SJ 527 | |
2012-02-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/12 | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 527 | |
2012-02-16 | SPB 7092 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1986) by Budget |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 618 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |