FL S1950 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring, rather than authorizing, that the reimbursement method for provider service networks be on a prepaid basis; deleting a requirement that the Agency for Health Care Administration provide the opportunity for public feedback on a certain waiver application; revising requirements relating to the databook published by the agency consisting of Medicaid utilization and spending data; deleting procedures for plan procurements when no provider service networks submit bids; providing that cancer hospitals meeting certain criteria are statewide essential providers, etc.
Title
Statewide Medicaid Managed Care Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#875 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#791 (Y: 77 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#791 (Y: 77 N: 38 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Chapter No. 2022-42 | |
2022-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2022-03-11 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-11 | House | Amendment 967698 Concur |
2022-03-11 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2022-03-11 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-11 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (739505) |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (967698) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | In returning messages |
2022-03-08 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 77, NAYS 38 |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-07 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-07 | House | Amendment 739505 adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Amendment 207883 Failed |
2022-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2022-03-04 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-03 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (594018) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/16/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2022-01-27 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H607 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
S1080 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
H7047 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1950
S1080 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
H7047 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1950
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 8132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 9124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 962 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 964 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 966 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 967 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 968 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 974 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 977 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 981 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 2053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |