FL H0607 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Medicaid managed care specialty plans to continue serving certain children whose guardians receive guardianship assistance payments under Guardianship Assistance Program.
Title
Medicaid Managed Care Specialty Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-12-06 | House | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-12-06 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-12-06 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-12-06 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2021-11-15 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1080 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
S1950 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-42
H7047 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1950
S1950 (Similar To) 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-42
H7047 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1950
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/607 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/607/BillText/Filed/PDF |