FL S1912 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01001; Substituted HB 7219 -SJ 01001; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7219 (Ch. 2010-142) -SJ 01001
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01001; Substituted HB 7219 -SJ 01001; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7219 (Ch. 2010-142) -SJ 01001
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the adoption of the 2010 version of the Internal Revenue Code. Provides exceptions. Provides for retroactive operation.
Title
Internal Revenue Code Adoption/2010 [WPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 01001; Substituted HB 7219 -SJ 01001; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7219 (Ch. 2010-142) -SJ 01001 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Special Order Calendar | |
2010-04-26 | Withdrawn from Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00863; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-19 | Favorable by General Government Appropriations; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 -SJ 00650; Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00650 | |
2010-04-14 | On Committee agenda-- General Government Appropriations, 04/19/10, 10:30 am, 401-S | |
2010-04-09 | Original reference(s) removed: Rules; Now in General Government Appropriations | |
2010-04-08 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-06 | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00543 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 301-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00129 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Finance and Tax; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules | |
2010-02-10 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7219 (Same As) 2010-05-28 - Chapter No. 2010-142