FL S1890 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the types of lessees whose purposes and functions are deemed to be governmental, municipal, or public purposes or functions; providing exemptions from ad valorem taxes for certain real property, etc.
Title
Government Property Tax Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
196 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 199 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1890 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1890/BillText/Filed/HTML |