FL S1886 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Regulated Industries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing contributions for early approval adult use dispensing organization licenses; authorizing the Department of Business and Professional Regulation to revise fees after a specified date; providing for certain mandatory contributions for obtaining early approval adult use dispensing organization licenses; levying a tax on the cultivation of cannabis; specifying the amount of the tax; providing for the collection, payment, and administration of the tax; levying a tax on cannabis purchases, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxes and Fees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2022-01-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1884 (Related) 2022-01-18 - Introduced
H551 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
H549 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
566801Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566804Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566806Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback