FL S1868 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the planning and construction of educational facilities. Prohibits a local governing body from denying a site applicant on the basis of a public school's capacity or its proposed capacity.
Title
Public Educational Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-22 | Introduced -SJ 238 | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Community Affairs; Budget -SJ 238 | |
2011-03-05 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1868 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1868/BillText/Filed/HTML |