FL S1866 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying disclosure requirements for applications or proposals for certain qualified shared underwriting result participation programs; requiring, under certain circumstances, a qualified shared underwriting result participation program form to be filed with the Office of Insurance Regulation, for informational purposes only, and providing that such form is not subject to certain approval; providing that the Rating Law does not apply to certain charges, deposits, or other payments in a qualified shared underwriting result participation program, etc.
Title
Workers' Compensation Shared Underwriting Result Participation Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-26 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/20/18, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1235 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 4102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |