FL S1852 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability to submit a report of its recommendations to the Governor and Legislature by a specified date, etc.
Title
Electromagnetic Pulse Preparedness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Communications, Energy, and Public Utilities; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1852 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1852/BillText/Filed/HTML |