FL S1844 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the Florida Career and Professional Education Act. Replaces references to local workforce boards with regional workforce boards. Requires that economic development agencies collaborate with each district school board, regional workforce boards, and postsecondary institutions to develop a strategic 5-year plan that addresses local and regional workforce demands. Requires that the strategic plan include access to courses offered through virtual education providers and a review of career and professional academy courses, etc.
Title
Career and Professional Academies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-03-28 | Now in Budget -SJ 286 | |
2011-03-24 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-23 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 -SJ 286 | |
2011-03-18 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/23/11, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Budget -SJ 210 | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 492 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 493 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4935 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |