FL S1810 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the "Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs Program Act"; creating the Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs Program within the Department of Law Enforcement; requiring the department to contract with a nonprofit corporation to administer and manage the program; prohibiting a former handler or an adopter from accumulating unused funds from a current year for use in a future year; prohibiting a former handler or an adopter from receiving reimbursement if funds are depleted for the year for which the reimbursement is sought; requiring the department to adopt rules, etc.
Title
Care for Retired Law Enforcement Dogs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/08/21, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/30/21, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1405 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee