FL S1808 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Abandoned Property Neighborhood Relief Act"; authorizing a mortgagee or mortgage servicer to enter certain abandoned property only under specified conditions; authorizing a county or municipality to notify a mortgagee or mortgage servicer that a residential real property has been determined to be abandoned, in midforeclosure, and a nuisance; requiring a mortgagee or mortgage servicer to abate the nuisance and maintain certain property upon receipt of specified notice, etc.
Title
Abandoned Residential Real Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Banking and Insurance |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1393 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
702 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
702 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
702 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
702 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
702 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
702 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
702 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
702 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1808 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1808/BillText/Filed/HTML |