FL S1806 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of State to be elected rather than appointed; providing that an applicant must designate a party affiliation to be registered to vote; repealing a provision relating to the closure of registration books for an election; requiring the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to provide the opportunity to preregister to vote to certain individuals; requiring the Division of Elections to maintain a strategic elections equipment reserve of voting systems for specified purposes, etc.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1305 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
100 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
100 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 5612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 697 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 181 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0555 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0556 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 0575 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 0981 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
99 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1806 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1806/BillText/Filed/HTML |