FL S1788 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a person to lawfully deny or fail to acknowledge certain expunged misdemeanor arrests when applying for specified employment positions or licenses, etc.
Title
Misdemeanor Criminal History Record Expunction
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Education |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Education; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H553 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1788 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1788/BillText/Filed/HTML |