FL S1782 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a prohibition on district school boards awarding annual contracts on the basis of unauthorized contingencies or conditions; deleting a prohibition on district school boards altering or limiting their authority to award or not award an annual contract; authorizing the district school board to award an extended contract to certain instructional personnel; authorizing the suspension or dismissal of personnel on an extended contract under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Contracts for Instructional Personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Education |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Education; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1479 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1782 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1782/BillText/Filed/HTML |