FL S1782 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Approved by Governor -SJ 00575; Chapter No. 2010-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Approved by Governor -SJ 00575; Chapter No. 2010-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes provisions which have become inoperative by noncurrent repeal or expiration and, pursuant to specified provisions, may be omitted from the 2010 Florida Statutes only through a reviser's bill duly enacted by the Legislature.
Title
Florida Statutes [WPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - House Roll Call No. 0532 - Passage (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0007 - Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0007 - Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Approved by Governor -SJ 00575; Chapter No. 2010-4 | |
2010-03-29 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -SJ 00371 | |
2010-03-16 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 00260 | |
2010-03-10 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00238; Passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 -HJ 00238 | |
2010-03-09 | Substituted for HB 7065 -HJ 00229; Read 2nd time -HJ 00229 | |
2010-03-03 | In Messages; Received, referred to Calendar -HJ 00202 | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00181; Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 -SJ 00182; Immediately certified -SJ 00182 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Rules -SJ 00121; On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/16/10, 8:45 am, 110-S; Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -SJ 00163; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00163; Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00007 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-02-16 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 | |
2010-02-08 | Filed; Referred to Rules; On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/16/10, 8:45 am, 110-S |
Same As/Similar To
H7065 (Similar To) 2010-03-09 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 1782; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1782 (Ch. 2010-4) -HJ 00229
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0110 | 1099 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0112 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0215 | 559 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0220 | 183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0253 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0253 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0287 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0373 | 1961 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0373 | 472 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0375 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0379 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0379 | 204 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0379 | 206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0380 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 7095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0403 | 890 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0408 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0624 | 5105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0733 | 702 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0985 | 0395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |