FL S1772 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services, in collaboration with specified entities, to determine the environmental value that agricultural lands and timberlands provide to this state based on certain factors, etc.
Title
Environmental Value of Agricultural Lands and Timberlands
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1311 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1772 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1772/BillText/Filed/HTML |