FL S1772 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the maximum number of years for which a specified millage may be levied; requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability, in conjunction with the Office of the Auditor General, to conduct certain studies and provide reports that meet specified requirements to the Governor and the Legislature by a specified date, etc.
Title
Charter School Capital Outlay Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Education |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1772 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1772/BillText/Filed/HTML |