FL S1768 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, and Mobile Homes of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation to establish the Office of Community Association Hearings; allowing the division to certify attorneys who are not employed by the division to act as community association hearing officers under specified conditions; specifying grounds for which a community association hearing officer may be terminated, etc.
Title
Community Associations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H625 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Commerce Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 1255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
719 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
720 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
723 | 078 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1768 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1768/BillText/Filed/HTML |