FL S1760 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising procedures governing voter registration administered by the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles; requiring the department to include a voter registration component on specified applications; requiring the Department of State to approve the voter registration component, etc.
Title
Voter Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
97 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1760 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1760/BillText/Filed/HTML |