FL S1758 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adding specified Florida State Hospital employees to the class, etc.
Title
Special Risk Class
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 02/21/18, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H493 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee