FL S1734 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a resident's attending health care provider in a nursing home facility to consult with the resident's personal physician, if selected, in the provision of acute care to the resident and before ordering or prescribing medication to the resident; requiring the resident's attending health care provider to document any such consultations in the resident's records; requiring nursing home facilities to take certain measures before admitting a resident; requiring nursing home facilities to provide each resident with the opportunity to select a personal physician; revising the timeframe in which nursing home facilities must furnish requested records of a current or former resident, etc.
Title
Resident Care in Nursing Home Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1361 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |