FL H1361 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires resident's attending health care provider to consult with resident's personal physician under certain circumstances; requires resident's attending health care provider to document consultations in resident's records; requires facilities to take certain measures before admitting residents; requires facilities to provide resident with opportunity to select personal physician; provides requirements for residents' records; revises timeframe in which facilities must furnish requested records; requires facilities to post specified information on their websites.
Title
Resident Care in Nursing Home Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-14 | House | Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2022-01-14 | House | Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2022-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1734 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 0221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 172 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 211 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
400 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 822 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
430 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
651 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1361 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1361/BillText/Filed/PDF |