FL S1718 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - CS failed to pass; YEAS 20 NAYS 20 -SJ 1189
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - CS failed to pass; YEAS 20 NAYS 20 -SJ 1189
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing parents of students who are assigned to certain underperforming public schools to submit a petition to the school district requesting implementation of a school turnaround option; requiring a school district, upon request, to provide a parent with a performance evaluation for each classroom teacher assigned to his or her child; prohibiting a charter school operator from being a foreign national principal, from having officers or partners who are not citizens of the United States and who are not lawfully admitted for permanent residence, or from being registered in a foreign country; creating the Parent Empowerment Act, etc.
Title
Parent Empowerment in Education
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Sen. Lizbeth Benacquisto [R] | Senate Budget Committee | Senate Education Pre-K - 12 Committee |
Sen. Anitere Flores [R] | Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Sen. Alan Hays [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#67 (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#77 (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#75 (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#73 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#69 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#71 (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#67 (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#77 (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#75 (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#73 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#69 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#71 (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | CS failed to pass; YEAS 20 NAYS 20 -SJ 1189 | |
2012-03-09 | Read 3rd time -SJ 1189 | |
2012-03-08 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-03-08 | Read 2nd time -SJ 1129 | |
2012-03-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/12 | |
2012-03-05 | CS/CS by Budget read 1st time -SJ 809 | |
2012-03-03 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 805 | |
2012-03-03 | CS/CS by- Budget; YEAS 13 NAYS 7 -SJ 805 | |
2012-03-02 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 03/03/12, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-03-01 | Now in Budget -SJ 743 | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations (519440); YEAS 4 NAYS 3 -SJ 743 | |
2012-02-23 | On Committee agenda-- Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations, 02/28/12, 10:45 am, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-27 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12 read 1st time -SJ 291 | |
2012-01-27 | Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on Education Pre-K - 12 Appropriations -SJ 282 | |
2012-01-25 | Now in Budget -SJ 280 | |
2012-01-25 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-01-24 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 280 | |
2012-01-19 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 01/24/12, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 229 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Budget -SJ 229 | |
2012-01-06 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 2315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |