FL S1712 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Chapter No. 2018-28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing state universities to use specified moneys to pay debt service on revenue bonds if required by a specified federal program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Postsecondary Revenue Bonds and Debt

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#810 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21 Chapter No. 2018-28
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-12 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-05SenateOrdered enrolled
2018-03-05HousePassed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-05HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-05HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 375
2018-03-04HouseReceived
2018-03-04HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-03-03HouseIn Messages
2018-03-03SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-03SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-02SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-02SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2018-03-01SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar --If Received
2018-03-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/02/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18 --If Received
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-14SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education, 02/14/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H375 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 1712

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101062Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback