FL S1700 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encouraging district school boards to place a school resource officer at each public school; authorizing part-time law enforcement officers to serve as school resource officers or school safety officers; providing requirements for the funding of the salaries of certain school resource officers and school safety officers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Resource Officer Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Education
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100612Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback