FL S1696 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the Division of Cannabis Management within the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; prohibiting the use of false identification by persons under 21 years of age for specified activities relating to recreational marijuana; exempting certain activities involving marijuana from use and possession offenses; authorizing persons 21 years of age or older to engage in certain activities involving the personal use, possession, transport, and cultivation of marijuana in limited amounts; providing that marijuana establishments that sell food containing marijuana are considered food establishments for the purposes of specified regulations; authorizing an individual convicted of certain crimes to petition the court for expunction of his or her criminal history record under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Adult Use Marijuana Legalization
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1624 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1626 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1698 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H467 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H549 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S776 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1488 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1884 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1471 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
S1626 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1698 (Related) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H467 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H549 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S776 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1488 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1884 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1471 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
556 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
562 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 0311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 039 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 0635 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 0073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0586 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1696 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/1696/BillText/Filed/HTML |