FL H0467 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes persons age 21 & over to engage in certain activities involving personal use of marijuana in limited amounts; provides for licensure of marijuana establishments; provides limits on number of certain marijuana establishments in localities; specifies that chapter does not apply to employer drug policies or operating under influence laws; removes cannabis from schedule of controlled substances; provides for retroactive effect; provides for sentencing review for certain offenders.
Title
Legalization of Recreational Marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2022-03-12 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-11-10 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Ways & Means Committee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-11-10 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-11-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6021 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
S776 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H549 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S1696 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1884 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1471 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
S776 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H549 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
S1696 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1884 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Regulated Industries
H1471 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
562 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 0331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 039 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
566 | 044 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
569 | 0073 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 552 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 13501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/467 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/467/BillText/Filed/PDF |