FL S1696 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the terms "athletics personnel" and "high-risk youth athletic activity"; requiring an entity that administers or conducts a high-risk youth athletic activity or training related to such activity on certain property to require certain unpaid or volunteer personnel to complete a specified course; requiring such personnel to complete the course within a specified number of days and then annually thereafter, etc.
Title
Youth Athletic Activity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1696 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1696/BillText/Filed/HTML |