FL S1690 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1306 (Ch. 2010-209)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1306 (Ch. 2010-209)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the phrase "Food Stamp Program" to the phrase "Food Assistance Program" in reference to federal waivers for the Passport to Economic Progress program.
Title
Passport to Economic Progress Program [CPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Commerce, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1306 (Ch. 2010-209) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health and Human Services Appropriations -SJ 00116 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Commerce; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health and Human Services Appropriations | |
2010-02-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1306 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-209
H1293 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 1306; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1306 (Ch. 2010-209) -HJ 01174
H1293 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 1306; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1306 (Ch. 2010-209) -HJ 01174