FL S1686 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Corrects cross-references. EFFECTIVE DATE: 07/01/2010.
Title
Uniform Commercial Code [CPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Commerce | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Commerce; Judiciary -SJ 00116 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Commerce; Judiciary | |
2010-02-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0668 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0671 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |