FL S1682 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1120 (Ch. 2021-185)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1120 (Ch. 2021-185)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting certain telephonic sales calls without the prior express written consent of the called party; removing provisions authorizing the use of certain automated telephone dialing systems; authorizing a court to increase an award for willful and knowing violations, etc.
Title
Telephone Solicitation
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1120 (Ch. 2021-185) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Now in Regulated Industries |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/29/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1307 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1120 (Ch. 2021-185)
S1120 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-185
S1120 (Similar To) 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-185