FL S1120 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Chapter No. 2021-185
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting certain telephonic sales calls without the prior express written consent of the called party; removing provisions authorizing the use of certain automated telephone dialing systems; providing a cause of action for aggrieved called parties; prohibiting a commercial telephone seller or salesperson from using automated dialing or recorded messages to make certain commercial telephone solicitation phone calls, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telephone Solicitation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#371 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-06 Chapter No. 2021-185
2021-06-29 Approved by Governor
2021-06-28 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-28SenateOrdered enrolled
2021-04-28HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-28HouseCS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-26House1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
2021-04-26HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021)
2021-04-26HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-22HouseIn Messages
2021-04-22SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-22SenateAmendment(s) adopted (826808)
2021-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-20SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2021-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-25SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2021-03-25SenateNow in Rules
2021-03-25SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-23SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-03-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/23/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-10SenateNow in Regulated Industries
2021-03-09SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2021-03-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/09/21, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-18SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Regulated Industries; Rules
2021-02-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H857 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
H1307 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1120 (Ch. 2021-185)
S1682 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1120 (Ch. 2021-185)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
501059Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501616Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64844Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/Amendment/456696/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/Amendment/113472/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/Amendment/826808/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/Analyses/2021s01120.pre.cm.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/Analyses/2021s01120.cm.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/Analyses/2021s01120.pre.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/Analyses/2021s01120.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/Analyses/2021s01120.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/Analyses/2021s01120.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/Vote/SenateVote_s01120c1028.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/Vote/HouseVote_s01120e1371.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/Vote/2021-03-09%201230PM~S01120%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/Vote/2021-03-23%200330PM~S01120%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1120/Vote/2021-04-20%200830AM~S01120%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback