FL S1680 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Community Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing a provision relating to a governmental entity's establishment of recreational customary use on a portion of a beach above the mean high-water line on private property, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Rules
2020-01-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6063 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
163035Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback